LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1849
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1849
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1849
Compare Versions
AB1849 Chaptered September 25, 2016
AB1849 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB1849 Amended August 17, 2016
AB1849 Amended June 16, 2016
AB1849 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1849 Introduced February 9, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1849 Chaptered September 25, 2016
AB1849 Enrolled August 29, 2016
AB1849 Amended August 17, 2016
AB1849 Amended June 16, 2016
AB1849 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1849 Introduced February 9, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare