|
09/23/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 20. Page 6186.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4957.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 21. Page 5049.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|