California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1853 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill June 20, 2016
Bill May 11, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016