California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB187 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill May 28, 2015
Bill March 4, 2015