LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB187
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB187
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB187
Compare Versions
AB187 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB187 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB187 Amended May 28, 2015
AB187 Amended March 4, 2015
AB187 Introduced January 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB187 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB187 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB187 Amended May 28, 2015
AB187 Amended March 4, 2015
AB187 Introduced January 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare