Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 7. Page 5251.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|