California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1872 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2016

Amended

Bill June 1, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016
Bill March 8, 2016