California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1872 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/01/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1872AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 8, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Gray FEBRUARY 10, 2016 An act  to amend Section 830.1 of the Penal Code,  relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1872, as amended, Gray. Public safety.  Existing law establishes categories of peace officers with varying powers and authority to make arrests and carry firearms. Under existing law, in certain counties, a deputy sheriff, who is employed to perform duties exclusively or initially relating to custodial assignments with responsibilities for maintaining the operations of county custodial facilities, is a peace officer whose authority extends to any place in the state only while engaged in the performance of the duties of his or her employment and for the purpose of carrying out the primary function of employment relating to his or her custodial assignments, or when performing other law enforcement duties directed by his or her employing agency during a local state of emergency.   This bill would include deputy sheriffs in the County of Merced within that definition of peace officers, as specified.  Under existing law, the University of California is established, under the administration of the Regents of the University of California, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. The University of California provides instruction to students at campuses in Berkeley, Davis, Irvine, Los Angeles, Merced, Riverside, San Diego, San Francisco, Santa Barbara, and Santa Cruz. This bill would appropriate $1,315,000 from the General Fund to the Regents of the University of California, for allocation to the University of California, Merced, for various public safety purposes. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 830.1 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 830.1. (a) Any sheriff, undersheriff, or deputy sheriff, employed in that capacity, of a county, any chief of police of a city or chief, director, or chief executive officer of a consolidated municipal public safety agency that performs police functions, any police officer, employed in that capacity and appointed by the chief of police or chief, director, or chief executive of a public safety agency, of a city, any chief of police, or police officer of a district, including police officers of the San Diego Unified Port District Harbor Police, authorized by statute to maintain a police department, any marshal or deputy marshal of a superior court or county, any port warden or port police officer of the Harbor Department of the City of Los Angeles, or any inspector or investigator employed in that capacity in the office of a district attorney, is a peace officer. The authority of these peace officers extends to any place in the state, as follows: (1) As to any public offense committed or which there is probable cause to believe has been committed within the political subdivision that employs the peace officer or in which the peace officer serves. (2) Where the peace officer has the prior consent of the chief of police or chief, director, or chief executive officer of a consolidated municipal public safety agency, or person authorized by him or her to give consent, if the place is within a city, or of the sheriff, or person authorized by him or her to give consent, if the place is within a county. (3) As to any public offense committed or which there is probable cause to believe has been committed in the peace officer's presence, and with respect to which there is immediate danger to person or property, or of the escape of the perpetrator of the offense. (b) The Attorney General and special agents and investigators of the Department of Justice are peace officers, and those assistant chiefs, deputy chiefs, chiefs, deputy directors, and division directors designated as peace officers by the Attorney General are peace officers. The authority of these peace officers extends to any place in the state where a public offense has been committed or where there is probable cause to believe one has been committed. (c) Any deputy sheriff of the County of Los Angeles, and any deputy sheriff of the Counties of Butte, Calaveras, Colusa, Glenn, Humboldt, Imperial, Inyo, Kern, Kings, Lake, Lassen, Mariposa, Mendocino, Merced, Plumas, Riverside, San Benito, San Diego, San Luis Obispo, Santa Barbara, Santa Clara, Shasta, Siskiyou, Solano, Sonoma, Stanislaus, Sutter, Tehama, Trinity, Tulare, Tuolumne, and Yuba who is employed to perform duties exclusively or initially relating to custodial assignments with responsibilities for maintaining the operations of county custodial facilities, including the custody, care, supervision, security, movement, and transportation of inmates, is a peace officer whose authority extends to any place in the state only while engaged in the performance of the duties of his or her respective employment and for the purpose of carrying out the primary function of employment relating to his or her custodial assignments, or when performing other law enforcement duties directed by his or her employing agency during a local state of emergency.   SEC. 2.   SECTION 1.  The sum of one million three hundred fifteen thousand dollars ($1,315,000) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the Regents of the University of California, for allocation to the University of California, Merced, for all of the following public safety purposes: (a) Forty thousand dollars ($40,000) for two mobile traffic message boards. (b) Three thousand dollars ($3,000) for two fire area of refuge consoles. (c) Eighteen thousand dollars ($18,000) for fire extinguisher training equipment. (d) Twenty-four thousand dollars ($24,000) for three fixed license plate recognition (LPR) camera systems. (e) One hundred forty thousand dollars ($140,000) for 40 EvacuChairs. (f) Fifty-two thousand dollars ($52,000) for 40 automated external defibrillators with training equipment. (g) Four hundred twenty thousand dollars ($420,000) for a mobile incident management vehicle and equipment. (h) One hundred fifty thousand dollars ($150,000) for a mobile use of force options system. (i) Thirty thousand dollars ($30,000) for six mobile computers with service. (j) Forty-two thousand dollars ($42,000) for six in-car video systems. (k) Ten thousand dollars ($10,000) for two vehicle-mounted LPR camera systems. (l) Fifteen thousand dollars ($15,000) for one Cellebrite system. (m) Seventy-five thousand dollars ($75,000) for one crime scene mapping system. (n) Sixty thousand dollars ($60,000) for three portable wireless camera systems. (o) Thirty-six thousand dollars ($36,000) for 360 crowd control barriers. (p) Two hundred thousand dollars ($200,000) for safety improvement to an energy dissipator on Fairfield Canal.