|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 744, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 31). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6544.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 30. Page 6580.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6469.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5414.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4689.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|