California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1889 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016