|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 450, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5870.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4878.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4459.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|