California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1891 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 22, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016