|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6150.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5806.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4873.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4462.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|