California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1894 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill May 18, 2016
Bill May 5, 2016
Bill March 1, 2016