California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1899 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill March 16, 2016