LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1899
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1899
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1899
Compare Versions
AB1899 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB1899 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1899 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1899 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1899 Amended March 16, 2016
AB1899 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1899 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB1899 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1899 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1899 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1899 Amended March 16, 2016
AB1899 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare