California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1911 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016