LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1911
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1911
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1911
Compare Versions
AB1911 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB1911 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1911 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1911 Amended June 16, 2016
AB1911 Amended March 31, 2016
AB1911 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1911 Amended March 18, 2016
AB1911 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1911 Chaptered September 26, 2016
AB1911 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1911 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1911 Amended June 16, 2016
AB1911 Amended March 31, 2016
AB1911 Amended March 28, 2016
AB1911 Amended March 18, 2016
AB1911 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare