California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB192 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015