LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB192
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB192
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB192
Compare Versions
AB192 Chaptered October 5, 2015
AB192 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB192 Amended September 1, 2015
AB192 Amended July 16, 2015
AB192 Amended July 8, 2015
AB192 Amended May 28, 2015
AB192 Amended April 20, 2015
AB192 Introduced January 28, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB192 Chaptered October 5, 2015
AB192 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB192 Amended September 1, 2015
AB192 Amended July 16, 2015
AB192 Amended July 8, 2015
AB192 Amended May 28, 2015
AB192 Amended April 20, 2015
AB192 Introduced January 28, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare