|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 29. Page 6430.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 4975.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 4625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|