California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1921 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016