California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1924 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill May 23, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016