LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1924
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1924
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1924
Compare Versions
AB1924 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB1924 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1924 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1924 Amended August 1, 2016
AB1924 Amended May 23, 2016
AB1924 Amended April 5, 2016
AB1924 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1924 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB1924 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1924 Amended August 19, 2016
AB1924 Amended August 1, 2016
AB1924 Amended May 23, 2016
AB1924 Amended April 5, 2016
AB1924 Introduced February 11, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare