|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 12. Page 6297.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5229.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 4856.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 4.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|