California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1926 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill March 30, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016