California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1934 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016