LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1934
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1934
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1934
Compare Versions
AB1934 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB1934 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1934 Amended August 18, 2016
AB1934 Amended August 1, 2016
AB1934 Amended June 14, 2016
AB1934 Amended June 1, 2016
AB1934 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1934 Amended April 4, 2016
AB1934 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1934 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB1934 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1934 Amended August 18, 2016
AB1934 Amended August 1, 2016
AB1934 Amended June 14, 2016
AB1934 Amended June 1, 2016
AB1934 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1934 Amended April 4, 2016
AB1934 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare