|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 6279.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5253.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4899.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|