California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1937 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill August 11, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016