Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2016 | Read first time. To print. |