California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1939 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/12/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1939AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 12, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Patterson FEBRUARY 12, 2016 An act to add  and repeal  Section 312.3 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1939, as amended, Patterson. Licensing requirements. Under existing law, the Department of Consumer Affairs is comprised of various boards, bureaus, commissions, committees, and similarly constituted agencies that license and regulate the practice of various professions and vocations for the purpose of protecting the people of California. Existing law requires each of these entities to submit annually to the director of the department its methods for ensuring that every licensing examination it administers is subject to periodic evaluation. This bill would require the  director of the department   Legislative Analyst's Office  to conduct a study and submit to the Legislature  and the department  by July 1, 2017, a report identifying, exploring, and addressing occupational licensing requirements that create unnecessary barriers to labor market entry or mobility.  The bill would repeal this requirement on January 1, 2021.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 312.3 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 312.3. (a) The  director   Legislative Analyst's Office  shall conduct a study and submit to the Legislature  and the Department of Consumer Affairs  by July 1, 2017, a report identifying, exploring, and addressing areas where occupational licensing requirements create an unnecessary barrier to labor market entry or labor mobility, particularly for dislocated workers, individuals who have moved to California from another state, transitioning service members, and military spouses. (b)  (1)    The report to be submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.  (2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2021.