|
10/07/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2946.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2508.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1103.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 17). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|