California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB195 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill June 23, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015