|
09/21/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6290.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5228.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5231.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|