California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016