Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 36. Page 5146.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Quirk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 7.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|