California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Amended

Bill May 18, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016