California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1960 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 5, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016