LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1960
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1960
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1960
Compare Versions
AB1960 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB1960 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1960 Amended August 17, 2016
AB1960 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1960 Amended May 5, 2016
AB1960 Amended March 18, 2016
AB1960 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1960 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB1960 Enrolled August 30, 2016
AB1960 Amended August 17, 2016
AB1960 Amended August 2, 2016
AB1960 Amended May 5, 2016
AB1960 Amended March 18, 2016
AB1960 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare