Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate third reading file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 4773.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4677.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 6.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|