California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1964 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 5, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016