Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6114.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5231.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5252.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1778.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|