LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB197
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB197
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB197
Compare Versions
AB197 Chaptered September 8, 2016
AB197 Enrolled August 24, 2016
AB197 Amended August 19, 2016
AB197 Amended August 2, 2016
AB197 Amended June 8, 2016
AB197 Amended April 29, 2015
AB197 Amended March 26, 2015
AB197 Introduced January 28, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB197 Chaptered September 8, 2016
AB197 Enrolled August 24, 2016
AB197 Amended August 19, 2016
AB197 Amended August 2, 2016
AB197 Amended June 8, 2016
AB197 Amended April 29, 2015
AB197 Amended March 26, 2015
AB197 Introduced January 28, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare