|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 665, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6353.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5271.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4955.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4887.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|