California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1979 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill May 23, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016