California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2015

Enrolled

Bill June 23, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 30, 2015

Amended

Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 11, 2015