LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB198
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB198
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB198
Compare Versions
AB198 Chaptered June 30, 2015
AB198 Enrolled June 23, 2015
AB198 Amended June 2, 2015
AB198 Amended May 11, 2015
AB198 Introduced January 28, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB198 Chaptered June 30, 2015
AB198 Enrolled June 23, 2015
AB198 Amended June 2, 2015
AB198 Amended May 11, 2015
AB198 Introduced January 28, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare