Assembly | 06/10/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Retained in suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2015 | Read first time. To print. |