LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB199
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB199
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB199
Compare Versions
AB199 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB199 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB199 Amended September 10, 2015
AB199 Amended August 25, 2015
AB199 Amended August 18, 2015
AB199 Amended June 9, 2015
AB199 Introduced January 29, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB199 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB199 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB199 Amended September 10, 2015
AB199 Amended August 25, 2015
AB199 Amended August 18, 2015
AB199 Amended June 9, 2015
AB199 Introduced January 29, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare